This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 09:05:05 (UTC).

Jaime Franco v. AECOM,et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Jaime Franco filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AECOM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00979

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jaime Franco

Defendants

AECOM Management Services Global Corp. a California corporation doing business as AECOM Management Services Group

AECOM a California corporation doing business as URS Federal Services

AECOM Services, Inc. a California corporation doing business as AECOM

AECOM Management Services, Inc. a California corporation doing business as AECOM Management Services Group

AECOM

URS Federal Services International, Inc. a California corporation doing business as URS

URS Holdings, Inc. a California corporation doing business as URS Federal Services

URS Federal Services, Inc.

URS Corporation

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

AECOM Inc. a California corporation doing business as AECOM

Amentum Services, Inc.

AECOM USA, Inc. a California corporation doing business as AECOM

URS Group, Inc. a California corporation doing business as URS Federal Services

AECOM Technology Corporation a California corporation doing business as URS Federal Services, Inc.

AECOM a California corporation doing business as AECOM Management Services Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank Gerald Chica

Attorney at Yoosefian Law Firm P.C.

135 South Jackson Street Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91205

Ronald Yoosefian

Attorney at Yoosefian Law Firm PC

135 South Jackson Street Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91205

Susana Oganesian

Attorney at Yoosefian Law Firm PC

135 South Jackson Street Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91205

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Yuda Siegel

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Arlen Gharibian

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Zoe Yuzna

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

#14

#13

#11

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant AECOM Management Services, Inc... (Yuzna, Zoe) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION of Adam Y. Siegel re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Amentum Services, Inc.. (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Amentum Services, Inc. Amentum Services, Inc..(Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL DEFENDANTS OTHER THAN AMENTUM SERVICES, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. AND URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.)by Judge John W. Holcomb. (yl)Defendant AMENTUM SERVICES, INC. and the parties it was erroneously sued as, AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC., are not dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Miscellaneous Document #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 06/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #12 by Deputy Clerk of Court. Pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.1, counsel is instructed to electronically lodge the proposed order, as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. Counsel is reminded to comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2. (iva) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notices>Notice of Dismissal of Party(ies). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulation to Dismiss Non-Employer Defendants Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Amentum Services, Inc. (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:21-cv-00979 JWH (SPx). (esa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Amentum Services, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 5, attachment 7)(esa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AECOM(a California corporation), AECOM Inc., AECOM Management Services Global Corp., AECOM Management Services, Inc., AECOM Services, Inc., AECOM Technology Corporation, AECOM USA, Inc., Does, URS Corporation, URS Federal Services International, Inc., URS Federal Services, Inc., URS Group, Inc., URS Holdings, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Jaime Franco. (filed in state court 3/19/21, submitted as document 5, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP, identifying Jaime Franco; Ronald Yoosefian, Esq.; Susana Oganesian, Esq.; Yoosefian Law Firm, P.C.; Amentum Services, Inc.; Adam Y. Siegel; Zoe Yuzna; Arlen Gharibian; Jackson Lewis P.C.. (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Adam Siegel re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Robert Rudisin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP. (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP. (Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2101504 Receipt No: ACACDC-31439837 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP. (Attorney Adam Yuda Siegel added to party AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a California corporation doing business as AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP(pty:dft))(Siegel, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amentum Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM Management Services, Inc. is a litigant