This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 08:52:58 (UTC).

Jaime Chicas v. Mendoza Jaddou et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Jaime Chicas filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mendoza Jaddou. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-24173

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea M Jaime Chicas

Defendants

Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Director of Potomac Service Center

Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eduardo Rigoberto Soto

Attorney at Eduardo Soto

999 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 1040

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea M Jaime Chicas (Soto, Eduardo) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Andrea M Jaime Chicas. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/3/2021, response/answer due 2/1/2022; Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 12/3/2021, response/answer due 2/1/2022, US Attorney General served on 12/3/2021, response/answer due 2/1/2022, US Attorney served on 12/3/2021, response/answer due 2/1/2022. (See DE#5 for document image). (jas) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrea M Jaime Chicas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of service)(Soto, Eduardo) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security , U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kpe) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (kpe) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (kpe) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15206543, filed by Andrea M Jaime Chicas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summon(s) DHS, #7 Summon(s) USCIS, #8 Summon(s) Atty Gen, #9 Summon(s) SAO)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Soto, Eduardo) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant