This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2019 at 08:16:35 (UTC).

Jae S. Nah v. Andrew V. Jablon et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Jae S Nah filed an Other lawsuit against Andrew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08310

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jae S. Nah

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Edward J. Nah

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Jae S Nah

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendants

Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh

Andrew Kim

Andrew V. Jablon

Michael E. Byerts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Stacey N Knox

Attorney at Resch Polster and Berger LLP

1840 Century Park East 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert W Barnes

Attorney at Resch Polster and Berger LLP

1840 Century Park East 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

18 #3

Exhibit 2

18 #2

Exhibit 1

18 #1

Declaration Andrew V. Jablon

#18

(#18) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION: 1) FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; 2) TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; AND 3) FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PRE-APPROVAL OF ANY FUTURE LITIGATION BY PLAINTIFF AS TO THE SUBJECT MATTER THIS DISPUTE filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew V. Jablon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh, identifying Plaintiff, Jae S. Nah (aka Edward J. Nah); Defendant Andrew V. Jablon; Defendant Michael E. Byerts; Defendant Andrew Kim; Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; and Defendant Brian Huh. (Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#16

(#16) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Michael E. Byerts(pty:dft))(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Andrew V. Jablon, Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh, identifying Plaintiff, Jae S. Nah (aka Edward J. Nah); Defendant Andrew V. Jablon; Defendant Michael E. Byerts; Defendant Andrew Kim; Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; and Defendant Brian Huh. (Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#13

(#13) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 Defendant Andrew V. Jablon's Joinder in Defendants' Motion: 1) For More Definite Statement; 2) To Dismiss for Lack of Subjection Matter Jurisdiction and; 3) For An Order Requiring Pre-Approval of Any Future LItigation By Plaintiff As To The Subject Matter Of This Dispute filed by Defendant Andrew V. Jablon. (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Andrew V. Jablon(pty:dft))(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 11/11/2019. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#15

(#15) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST OF EX-PARTE BY DEFENDANTS FOR CONFLICT OF INTERESTS BETWEEN ATTORNEYS, DEFENDANTS AND FOR MISLEADING JUDICIAL PROCESS re: Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Plaintiff Jae S. Nah. (iv) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Declaration of Andrew V. Jablon

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2019 (erroneously filed as 11/8/2019) at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew V. Jablon, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Andrew Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh(pty:dft)) (Knox, Stacey) Modified on 10/28/2019 (cw). (Entered: 10/25/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION: 1) FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; 2) TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; AND 3) FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PRE-APPROVAL OF ANY FUTURE LITIGATION BY PLAINTIFF AS TO THE SUBJECT MATTER THIS DISPUTE filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew V. Jablon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh, identifying Plaintiff, Jae S. Nah (aka Edward J. Nah); Defendant Andrew V. Jablon; Defendant Michael E. Byerts; Defendant Andrew Kim; Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; and Defendant Brian Huh. (Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Michael E. Byerts(pty:dft))(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Andrew V. Jablon, Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh, identifying Plaintiff, Jae S. Nah (aka Edward J. Nah); Defendant Andrew V. Jablon; Defendant Michael E. Byerts; Defendant Andrew Kim; Defendant Royal Printex, Inc.; and Defendant Brian Huh. (Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 Defendant Andrew V. Jablon's Joinder in Defendants' Motion: 1) For More Definite Statement; 2) To Dismiss for Lack of Subjection Matter Jurisdiction and; 3) For An Order Requiring Pre-Approval of Any Future LItigation By Plaintiff As To The Subject Matter Of This Dispute filed by Defendant Andrew V. Jablon. (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Andrew V. Jablon(pty:dft))(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 11/11/2019. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST OF EX-PARTE BY DEFENDANTS FOR CONFLICT OF INTERESTS BETWEEN ATTORNEYS, DEFENDANTS AND FOR MISLEADING JUDICIAL PROCESS re: Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Plaintiff Jae S. Nah. (iv) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Knox, Stacey) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2019 (erroneously filed as 11/8/2019) at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew V. Jablon, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Andrew Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey N Knox added to party Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh(pty:dft)) (Knox, Stacey) Modified on 10/28/2019 (cw). (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. correcting Notice of Related Case(s) #7 NOTICE OF ERRATA AS TO CM/ECF OPTION WHEN FILING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES ON OCTOBER 8, 2019 [DKT. 7] (Jablon, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-03767-VAP-JCX (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jablon, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jae S. Nah. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Michael E. Byerts, Andrew V. Jablon, Andrew Kim, Royal Printex Inc. and Brian Huh.Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.(Filing Fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jae S. Nah. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL PRINTEX INC.L is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey N Knox