This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2020 at 08:10:47 (UTC).

Jacques v. Hoerbiger Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Jacques filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hoerbiger Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward J. Jacques

Defendant

Hoerbiger Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilmer D. Masterson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore

3109 Carlisle Street, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorney

Mauro Ramirez

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

910 Louisiana, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hoerbiger Service, Inc..(Ramirez, Mauro) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Hoerbiger Service, Inc. answer due 3/2/2020. (se) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIt is ORDERED the Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Plaintiff's Original Complaint, Doc. #6 filed January 21, 2020, is GRANTED. The deadline for the Defendant to file its answer or otherwise plead is extended to March 2, 2020. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Hoerbiger Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Mauro) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Edward J. Jacques. Hoerbiger Service, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Masterson, Wilmer) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hoerbiger Service, Inc. (se) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (se) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Edward J. Jacques. (Masterson, Wilmer) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Edward J. Jacques. (Masterson, Wilmer) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13046955), filed by Edward J. Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Masterson, Wilmer) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoerbiger Service Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W D Masterson, III