This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:36:39 (UTC).

Jacoby v. White, Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Jacoby filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against White, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00447

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Jacoby

Defendants

Mark Trosen

Frank White, Jr.

V. Edwin Stoll

Dennis Dumovich

Jackson County, Missouri

Whitney Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrie Mulholland Brous

Attorney at Brous Law LLC

3965 West 83Rd Street, Suite 115

Prairie Village, KS 66208

Defendant Attorneys

Paul D. Seyferth

Attorney at Seyferth Blumenthal & Harris LLC

4801 Main Street, Suite 310

Kansas City, MO 64112

Charlie J Harris, Jr

Attorney at Seyferth Blumenthal & Harris LLC

4801 Main Street, Suite 310

Kansas City, MO 64112

Linda AdeBunmi Adeniji

Attorney at Seyferth Blumenthal & Harris LLC

4801 Main Street, Suite 310

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Scott Jacoby. (Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Jacoby filed by Carrie Mulholland Brous on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Jacoby.(Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DAMAGES on behalf of Dennis Dumovich, Jackson County, Missouri, Whitney Miller, V. Edwin Stoll, Mark Trosen, Frank White, Jr.(Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - process, pleadings, and orders

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/15/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/29/2019. Signed on 6/13/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV05910, filed by Paul D. Seyferth on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6347771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - process, pleadings, and orders, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants filed by Charlie J Harris, Jr on behalf of Defendants Dennis Dumovich, Jackson County, Missouri, Whitney Miller, V. Edwin Stoll, Mark Trosen, Frank White, Jr.(Attorney Charlie J Harris, Jr added to party Mark Trosen(pty:dft))(Harris, Charlie) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#8

(#8) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for extension of time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON THE DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Paul D. Seyferth on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Scott Jacoby. (Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Jacoby filed by Carrie Mulholland Brous on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Jacoby.(Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants filed by Charlie J Harris, Jr on behalf of Defendants Dennis Dumovich, Jackson County, Missouri, Whitney Miller, V. Edwin Stoll, Mark Trosen, Frank White, Jr.(Attorney Charlie J Harris, Jr added to party Mark Trosen(pty:dft))(Harris, Charlie) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/12/2019 as Document No. 7, Joint Proposed Scheduling and Trial Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#7) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Scott Jacoby. (Brous, Carrie) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DAMAGES on behalf of Dennis Dumovich, Jackson County, Missouri, Whitney Miller, V. Edwin Stoll, Mark Trosen, Frank White, Jr.(Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of time. The defendants must file their responsive pleadings on or before June 28, 2019. Signed on June 13, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for extension of time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON THE DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Paul D. Seyferth on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/15/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/29/2019. Signed on 6/13/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV05910, filed by Paul D. Seyferth on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6347771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - process, pleadings, and orders, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seyferth, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.