This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 07:52:40 (UTC).

Jacobson v. Mulpuri et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Jacobson filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Mulpuri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01719

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Jacobson

Defendants

Rao Mulpuri

Nigel Gormly

Harold Hughes

Tom Leppert

Toby Cosgrove

Lisa Picard

Julie Larson-Green

Nominal Defendant

View, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Toby Cosgrove, Nigel Gormly, Harold Hughes, Julie Larson-Green, Tom Leppert, Rao Mulpuri, Lisa Picard - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3757043.) - filed by Matthew Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Jacobson: For All Defendants. (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Jacobson: For All Defendants. (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Toby Cosgrove, Nigel Gormly, Harold Hughes, Julie Larson-Green, Tom Leppert, Rao Mulpuri, Lisa Picard - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3757043.) - filed by Matthew Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst