This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:33:35 (UTC).

Jacobs v. Hildebrand et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Jacobs filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hildebrand. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Kathleen L. DeSoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittney Jacobs

Defendants

Corey O'Neill

John Doe

City of Livingston, Montana

Chance Hildebrand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzanne C. Marshall

Attorney at MARSHALL LAW FIRM

2050 Fairway Drive, Suite 205

Bozeman, MT 59715

Jami Rebsom

Attorney at JAMI REBSOM LAW FIRM, PLLC

Po Box 670

Livingston, MT 59047

Defendant Attorney

Randall G. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Livingston, Montana. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/19/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/19/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/19/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/27/2020. (SMD) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Issued as to City of Livingston, Montana, John Doe, Chance Hildebrand, Corey O'Neill. (JDH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2562047 (JDH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against City of Livingston, Montana, John Doe, Chance Hildebrand, Corey O'Neill, filed by Brittney Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall G. Nelson