This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:18:08 (UTC).

Jacobs et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Jacobs filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Delta Air Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Terrence G. Berg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-10088

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Jacobs

Rivka Jacobs

Gabriella Jacobs

Jordana Jacobs

E.J.

Defendants

Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at Radner Law Group, PLLC

17515 W Nine Mile Rd, Suite 1175

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorneys

Scott R. Torpey

Attorney at Jaffe, Raitt,

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034-8214

Timothy James O'Connell

Attorney at Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss, P.C.

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James O'Connell on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (O'Connell, Timothy) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER Requiring Parties to Submit a Joint Discovery Plan. (Response due by 2/3/2023) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#7

(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#8

(#8) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/27/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/3/2024 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for the Exchange of Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for the Exchange of Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/27/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/3/2024 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Requiring Parties to Submit a Joint Discovery Plan. (Response due by 2/3/2023) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James O'Connell on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (O'Connell, Timothy) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-015202-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9193583 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Torpey, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less