This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2021 at 08:25:05 (UTC).

Jacobs et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Jacobs filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00910

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Omeally

William Walker

Jesse Tallon

Renard McCoy

Brent Jacobs

Jeremiah Sammons

Defendants

Aearo Technologies LLC

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia N Sieben

Attorney at Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben

80 S 8Th St Ste 5120

Mpls, MN 55402

William R Sieben

Attorney at Schwebel Goetz & Sieben, P.A.

5120 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew James Barber

Attorney at Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben

80 S. 8Th Street, Ste 5120

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel E Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Mpls, MN 55402

Amanda M Williams

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Jerry W Blackwell

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

S Jamal Faleel

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibits A- M

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A- M)(Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

12 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#11

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

9 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8655889) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A- M)(Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-910 (JRT/KMM). (MKB) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8655889) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faris Rashid

Latest cases represented by Lawyer S Jamal Faleel