This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:41 (UTC).

JACOB v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by JACOB against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17215

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADAM S. JACOB, JR.

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Letter filed from Jacob Adams. (jmh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 00-697, filed by ADAM S. JACOB, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter filed from Jacob Adams. (jmh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 00-697, filed by ADAM S. JACOB, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.