This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2020 at 07:05:59 (UTC).

Jacob v. County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Jacob filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01043

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonas Hiloha Jacob

Defendants

County Commissioners of Oklahoma County

PD Taylor

Oklahoma County Sheriff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin R Kemper

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin R Kemper

Po Box 2879

Norman, OK 73070

Tom M Cummings

Attorney at Tom M Cummings Inc

701 Nw 13Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103-2206

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron C Etherington

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Carri A Remillard

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Rodney J Heggy

Attorney at Oklahoma County Courthouse

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 409

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonas Hiloha Jacob (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#17

(#17) STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Cummings, Tom) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 1/6/2020 (md). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff requests an extension of time until January 6, 2020, to respond to Defendants' dismissal motions [Doc. Nos. 5-7]. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response(s) to Defendants' dismissal motions on or before January 6, 2020.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/9/2019. (rb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Ray Kemper. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/6/2019. (md) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit Supplementation

13 #1

Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#13

(#13) SECOND MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046582 by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Supplementation)(Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#12

(#12) STRICKEN AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046184 by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cummings, Tom) Pursuant to Notice on 12/2/2019 (md). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma County Sheriff, PD Taylor (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma County Sheriff, PD Taylor (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Docket CJ-2019-5648

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - EA Kemper

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Amended Petition

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition CJ-2019-5648

#1

(#8) Receipt for Money Received from Oklahoma County Sheriff in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077151 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (rb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonas Hiloha Jacob (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FROM THE COURT #17 MOTION to Dismiss is STRICKEN as this document is not a Motion. (md) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Cummings, Tom) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 1/6/2020 (md). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff requests an extension of time until January 6, 2020, to respond to Defendants' dismissal motions [Doc. Nos. 5-7]. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response(s) to Defendants' dismissal motions on or before January 6, 2020.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/9/2019. (rb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Extension of Time by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Ray Kemper. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/6/2019. (md) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SECOND MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046582 by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Supplementation)(Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FROM THE COURT #12 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046184 is STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to supplement the answers to questions 5 and 6 on the attached Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice as is required. (md) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STRICKEN AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3046184 by Jonas Hiloha Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cummings, Tom) Pursuant to Notice on 12/2/2019 (md). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE from the Court #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3044455 is STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to attach the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (md) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom M Cummings on behalf of Jonas Hiloha Jacob (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Defendants shall provide service to Plaintiff via his counsel by permissible means other than the Courts ECF system until such time as Plaintiffs current counsel or another counsel appearing on his behalf is a registered participant in the Courts ECF System. Defendants shall provide service to Plaintiff via his counsel of all filings made to date upon Defendants counsels receipt of this Order. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/14/2019. (md) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Receipt for Money Received from Oklahoma County Sheriff in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077151 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (rb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition by Oklahoma County Sheriff. (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition by PD Taylor. (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition by County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Carri A Remillard on behalf of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma County Sheriff, PD Taylor (Remillard, Carri) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma County Sheriff, PD Taylor (Heggy, Rodney) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron C Etherington on behalf of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma County Sheriff, PD Taylor (Etherington, Aaron) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-5648 filed by PD Taylor, Oklahoma County Sheriff, County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition CJ-2019-5648, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - EA Kemper, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket CJ-2019-5648, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tom M Cummings(Designation Retained)