This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2021 at 07:02:31 (UTC).

Jaco Electronics Incorporated et al v. Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Jaco Electronics Incorporated filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01902

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vermont Street Acquisition LLC

Jaco Electronics Incorporated

Defendants

Nichicon Corporation

Matsuo Electric Company Limited

United Chemi-Con Incorporated

Taitsu Corporation

Toshin Kogyo Company Limited

Hitachi AIC Incorporated

Nissei Electric Company Limited

Taitsu America Incorporated

Shinyei Technology Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited

Nichicon (America) Corporation

Rubycon America Incorporated

Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited

ELNA Company Limited

ELNA America Incorporated

Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated

Shinyei Kaisha

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shalia S Sakona

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Justin Robert DePaul

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Amy Abdo

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Robert W Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lori P. Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod, LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131-3456

Scott N. Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2500

Miami, FL 33131

Jerry Goldsmith

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Ilana A. Drescher

1450 Brickelle Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Robert William Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131-5340

Jerry Robert Goldsmith

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 300

Miami, FL 33131

Ilana Arnowitz Drescher

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel William Fox

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Steven Shea Kaufhold

Attorney at Kaufhold Gaskin Gallagher LLP

485 Pacific Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94133

Chul Pak

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Claire M Maddox

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

John F. Cove, Jr.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

535 Mission Street, 25Th Floor, Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94105-2997

Djordje Petkoski

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20004-2128

Heather S. Nyong'o

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

One Front Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

John R Fornaciari

Attorney at BakerHostetler

1050 Conn. Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#42

#2711

RESTRICTED

#2710

#1365

#1281

RESTRICTED

#1279

#9

#8

#7

6 #21

Summons

6 #20

Summons

6 #19

Summons

6 #18

Summons

6 #17

Summons

6 #16

Summons

6 #15

Summons

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Scott N. Wagner (to withdraw Jerry R. Goldsmith as counsel) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/29/2021) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gaspare J. Bono (to withdraw Claire M. Maddox as counsel) (Bono, Gaspare) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Gaspare J. Bono (Bono, Gaspare) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 8/11/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#39) ORDER. The concurrent expert proceeding in the DAP cases will be held on August 11, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to email Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark (jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. on August 10, 2020, the names of their lead counsel and experts who will be speaking during the proceeding. The experts and lead counsel are requested to call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-16-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1280 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#35) ORDER. The status conference set for April 16, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 15, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Z oom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://zoom.us/j/98659502400?pwd=L1gvYlg5c0p5UmxkWkJLNVF2VGJzZ z09 Webinar ID: 986 5950 2400 Password: 858633 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98659502400# or +13017158592,,98659502400# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn < br

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2801. (MAP) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Shalia Marie Sakona on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/14/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Related Case by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to ELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Rubycon America Incorporated, Rubycon Corporation, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Taitsu America Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited, United Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16647589. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1705-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16647589 filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vermont Street Acquisition LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hitachi AIC Incorporated is a litigant