This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 21:02:01 (UTC).

Jaco Electronics Incorporated et al v. Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Jaco Electronics Incorporated filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01705

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vermont Street Acquisition LLC

Jaco Electronics Incorporated

Defendants

Nichicon Corporation

Matsuo Electric Company Limited

United Chemi-Con Incorporated

Taitsu Corporation

Toshin Kogyo Company Limited

Hitachi AIC Incorporated

Nissei Electric Company Limited

Taitsu America Incorporated

Shinyei Technology Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company Limited

Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited

Nichicon (America) Corporation

Rubycon America Incorporated

Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited

ELNA Company Limited

ELNA America Incorporated

Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated

Shinyei Kaisha

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Abdo

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Ilana A Drescher

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Jerry Goldsmith

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Justin Robert DePaul

Attorney at Fennemore Craig PC - Phoenix, AZ

2394 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Lori P Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Robert W Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Scott N Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Shalia S Sakona

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

1450 Brickell Ave., Ste. 2300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2801. (MAP) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/14/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#7

6 #21

Summons

6 #20

Summons

6 #19

Summons

6 #17

Summons

6 #16

Summons

6 #14

Summons

6 #12

Summons

6 #10

Summons

6 #9

Summons

6 #8

Summons

6 #5

Summons

6 #4

Summons

6 #3

Summons

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

Summons

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the Northern District of California. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-1902. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Ilana Drescher on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Scott Wagner, Lori Lustrin and Jerry Goldsmith on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Robert W Turken on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketRemark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2801. (MAP) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Shalia Marie Sakona on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/14/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to ELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Rubycon America Incorporated, Rubycon Corporation, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Taitsu America Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited, United Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16647589. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1705-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16647589 filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vermont Street Acquisition LLC is a litigant