This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2019 at 07:32:15 (UTC).

Jackson v. Zaderej et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Jackson filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Zaderej. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01976

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Jackson

Defendants

Jamie M. Grooms

Guido Neels

Amy Wendell

Mark Gold

Quentin S. Blackford

Peter J. Mariani

Alan M. Levine

Robert J. Rudelius

Karen Zaderej

Gregory G. Freitag

Interested Party

Axogen, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Mark Nespole

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Cullin Avram O'Brien

Attorney at Cullin O'Brien Law, P.A.

6541 Ne 21St Way

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33308

 

Court Documents

11 #10

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #9

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #8

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #7

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #6

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #5

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #4

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #3

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #2

Executed Waiver of Service

11 #1

Executed Waiver of Service

#11

#10

#9

8 #3

Proposed Summons

6 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

6 #2

Notice of Filing

6 #1

Designation

#6

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER of service returned executed on August 29, 2019 by Harvey Jackson as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service, #2 Executed Waiver of Service, #3 Executed Waiver of Service, #4 Executed Waiver of Service, #5 Executed Waiver of Service, #6 Executed Waiver of Service, #7 Executed Waiver of Service, #8 Executed Waiver of Service, #9 Executed Waiver of Service, #10 Executed Waiver of Service)(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Gregory M. Nespole, appearing on behalf of Harvey Jackson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057897.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Gregory M. Nespole to appear pro hac vice. (WCD) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS issued as to Amy Wendell. (DG) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS issued as to Axogen, Inc., Quentin S. Blackford, Gregory G. Freitag, Mark Gold, Jamie M. Grooms, Alan M. Levine, Peter J. Mariani, Guido Neels, Robert J. Rudelius, Karen Zaderej. (DG) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Harvey Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory M. Nespole. If counsel has not already done so, within 10 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/22/2019. (AHA) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Gregory M. Nespole to appear pro hac vice by Harvey Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Designation, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Brien, Cullin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE to counsel Gregory M. Nespole of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DG) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/12/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/12/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1976-T-36CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15789298) filed by Harvey Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification by Harvey Jackson)(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Nespole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cullin Avram O'Brien