This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:33:04 (UTC).

Jackson v. Wells Fargo Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Jackson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wells Fargo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07990

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryon Jackson

San Ramon, CA 94583

Defendants

Ashley K. Lown

Wells Fargo Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jamie Rudman

Attorney at Sanchez and Amador, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryon Jackson re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Bryon Jackson, Other Affiliate Ashley K. Lown, Other Affiliate Strategic Staffing Solutions, L.C., Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Inc.. (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Inc. re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashley K. Lown, Wells Fargo Inc. (Filing fee $ 400-#34611146169). Filed byBryon Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #2

receipt

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint byWells Fargo Inc.. (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Inc. re: Answer to Complaint (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ashley K. Lown, Wells Fargo Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Inc. re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Inc. re: Answer to Complaint (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Bryon Jackson, Other Affiliate Ashley K. Lown, Other Affiliate Strategic Staffing Solutions, L.C., Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Inc.. (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint byWells Fargo Inc.. (Rudman, Jamie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryon Jackson re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Ashley K. Lown, Wells Fargo Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ashley K. Lown, Wells Fargo Inc. (Filing fee $ 400-#34611146169). Filed byBryon Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.