This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

Jackson v. Warden Joseph Headly et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warden Joseph Headly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anna M Manasco and Nicholas A Danella. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

Referral Judge

Nicholas A Danella

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olando Jackson

Clayton, AL 36016

Burger

159527, Ventruss Correction Facility

Clayton, AL 36016

Defendants

Lt. Michael O. Calhoun

Lamar Walker

Demetra L. Corciino

Department of Corrections

Joseph Headley

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Prisoner Case Number. (DNW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#1

No Description Available

#3

(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION:The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the court TRANSFER this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 8/10/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER transferring case to the Middle District of Alabama; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be sent electronically to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 09/09/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER transferring case to the Middle District of Alabama; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be sent electronically to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 09/09/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION:The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the court TRANSFER this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 8/10/2022. (DNW) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Prisoner Case Number. (DNW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURGERS #2 INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant