This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:18:57 (UTC).

Jackson v. United States

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05483

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isaac Jackson

Fairburn, GA 30213

Defendant

United States

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-05483-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Isaac Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER - After consideration by the Court of the affidavit of indigency only, plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), and he shall be allowed to proceed with this action without prepayment of filing fees, docket costs, or United States Marshals Service fees. However, it is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at the present time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/6/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 Complaint for a frivolity determination, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (tcc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isaac Jackson re #4 Order Reassigning Case. (tcc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-05483-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 Complaint for a frivolity determination, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Isaac Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Isaac Jackson re #2 Order. (tcc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER - After consideration by the Court of the affidavit of indigency only, plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), and he shall be allowed to proceed with this action without prepayment of filing fees, docket costs, or United States Marshals Service fees. However, it is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at the present time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/6/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Isaac Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.