This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 07:50:12 (UTC).

Jackson v. R&R Tool, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Jackson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against R R Tool, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00275

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Jackson

Defendant

R&R Tool, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Joseph Butler

Attorney at Mezibov Butler

615 Elsinore Place, Suite 105

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against R&R Tool, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8873483), filed by Andrew Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Right to Sue) (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Right to Sue

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to R&R Tool, Inc. on 5/20/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to R&R Tool, Inc. on 5/20/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against R&R Tool, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8873483), filed by Andrew Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Right to Sue) (Butler, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Joseph Butler