This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2022 at 07:41:15 (UTC).

JACKSON v. PHILBIN

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 JACKSON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against PHILBIN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC T TREADWELL and CHARLES H WEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

Referral Judge

CHARLES H WEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON

Grovetown, GA 30813

Respondent

WARDEN EDWARD PHILBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

CLINT C MALCOLM

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

PAULA K SMITH

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW 03

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

2 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

4 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. ORDER to Amend Complaint. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/17/2022. (vs) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of EDWARD PHILBIN Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party EDWARD PHILBIN(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of EDWARD PHILBIN Attorney CLINT C MALCOLM added to party EDWARD PHILBIN(pty:res)(MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by EDWARD PHILBIN ); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(vs) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of EDWARD PHILBIN Attorney CLINT C MALCOLM added to party EDWARD PHILBIN(pty:res)(MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of EDWARD PHILBIN Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party EDWARD PHILBIN(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. ORDER to Amend Complaint. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/17/2022. (vs) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DESI LEE HYMAN JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith