This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:04:18 (UTC).

Denis Jackson v. National Express Transit Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Denis Jackson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Express Transit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09231

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denis Jackson

Defendants

National Express Transit Corporation

National Express, LLC

NE Durham Hold Corp

Durham School Services L.P.

Durham School Services

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Aaron Sampson

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

6100 Center Drive Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Joshua Bordin-Wosk

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

6100 Center Drive Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

Bailey Ann McCabe

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

400 Capitol Mall Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Katessa M Charles

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 11/18/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on January 24, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: July 11, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: July 15, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#15

(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff 7-10 days; Defendant 5-7 days, filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation.. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Benjamin Aaron Sampson Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with LR re Efiling filed by Plaintiff Denis Jackson. (Sampson, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (Charles, Katessa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on December 14, 2021. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for January 24, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 10, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09231 JFW(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on 12/02/2021. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATOIN AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, identifying National Express LLC, NE Durham UK Limited. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit F - Proof of Service of Complaint, Summons, Etc.

1 #5

Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration of Carrie Steben

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 11/18/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on January 24, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: July 11, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: July 15, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff 7-10 days; Defendant 5-7 days, filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation.. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Benjamin Aaron Sampson Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with LR re Efiling filed by Plaintiff Denis Jackson. (Sampson, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (Charles, Katessa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on December 14, 2021. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for January 24, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 10, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 45, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09231 JFW(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on 12/02/2021. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation in Ventura Superior Court on 11/23/2021, attached as Exhibit G.(jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Denis Jackson in Ventura Superior Court on 10/7/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATOIN AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, identifying National Express LLC, NE Durham UK Limited. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2021-00558776 Receipt No: ACACDC-32386319 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carrie Steben, #2 Declaration of Bailey A. McCabe, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages, #4 Exhibit B - Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit E - ADR Information, #8 Exhibit F - Proof of Service of Complaint, Summons, Etc., #9 Exhibit G - Answer to Complaint for Damages, #10 Exhibit H - Durham School Services Search Results, #11 Exhibit I - NE Durham Hold Corp Search Results) (Attorney Bailey Ann McCabe added to party National Express Transit Corporation(pty:dft))(McCabe, Bailey) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where DURHAM SCHOOL SERVICE L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katessa M Charles