This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:51:46 (UTC).

Jackson v. Martin

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shon T. Erwin and Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph M Jackson

Sayre, OK 73662

Defendant

Jimmy Martin

 

Court Documents

8 #8

Attachment Letter and Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC

8 #7

Exhibit Westlaw Printout re Repreives, commutations, paroles and pardons

8 #6

Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M Jackson

8 #5

Exhibit G - Westlaw Printout re Consideration for parole

8 #4

Exhibit F - LARC Case Plan

8 #3

Exhibit E - Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing Results

8 #2

Exhibit D - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board re July 2020 Parole Docket

8 #1

Exhibit C - Westlaw Printout

#8

(#8) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Westlaw Printout, #2 Exhibit D - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board re July 2020 Parole Docket, #3 Exhibit E - Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing Results, #4 Exhibit F - LARC Case Plan, #5 Exhibit G - Westlaw Printout re Consideration for parole, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M Jackson, #7 Exhibit Westlaw Printout re Repreives, commutations, paroles and pardons, #8 Attachment Letter and Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241)(em) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Petition ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which habeas relief could be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/18/2020. (mc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Receipt for Money Received from Joseph M Jackson in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500081548 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed to Joseph M Jackson #113907 SAYRE-NFCC FN117 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (kah) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #6

Envelope

1 #5

Attachment 5- Cover Letter

1 #4

Attachment 4- LARC Case Plan

1 #3

Attachment 3- Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing results

1 #2

Attachment 2- Letter

1 #1

Attachment 1- westlake information

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Westlaw information, #2 Attachment 2- Letter, #3 Attachment 3- Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing results, #4 Attachment 4- LARC Case Plan, #5 Attachment 5- Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Westlaw Printout, #2 Exhibit D - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board re July 2020 Parole Docket, #3 Exhibit E - Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing Results, #4 Exhibit F - LARC Case Plan, #5 Exhibit G - Westlaw Printout re Consideration for parole, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M Jackson, #7 Exhibit Westlaw Printout re Repreives, commutations, paroles and pardons, #8 Attachment Letter and Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241)(em) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Petition ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which habeas relief could be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/18/2020. (mc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Receipt for Money Received from Joseph M Jackson in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500081548 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed to Joseph M Jackson #113907 SAYRE-NFCC FN117 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (kah) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/17/2020. (rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case.Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/17/2020. (rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PREVIOUS Cases (rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph M Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Westlaw information, #2 Attachment 2- Letter, #3 Attachment 3- Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing results, #4 Attachment 4- LARC Case Plan, #5 Attachment 5- Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less