This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:52:39 (UTC).

Jackson v. Madison Security Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Jackson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Madison Security Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08721

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antony Jackson

Defendant

Madison Security Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Scott Schaffer

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer LLP

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Frank Joseph Mazzaferro

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer LLP

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Joseph Mazzaferro on behalf of Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Security Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) Modified on 11/3/2021 (sj). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Security Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Security Group, Inc...(sj) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Madison Security Group, Inc. served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. Service was accepted by Joseph Lizardi. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/22/2021 adjourned to 1/26/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Madison Security Group, Inc. served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. Service was accepted by Joseph Lizardi. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/22/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Security Group, Inc...(sj) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Security Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Frank Joseph Mazzaferro to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name has a typographical error in caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Security Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) Modified on 11/3/2021 (sj). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Joseph Mazzaferro on behalf of Antony Jackson..(Mazzaferro, Frank) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian Scott Schaffer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the incorrect case number is on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Scott Schaffer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Antony Jackson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Scott Schaffer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1453; Nature of Suit code 950 (Constitutional - State Statute); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 790 (Labor: Other); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State);. (jgo) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Security Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Schaffer, Brian) Modified on 10/26/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schaffer, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Madison Security Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25239394)Document filed by Antony Jackson..(Schaffer, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Scott Schaffer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank Joseph Mazzaferro