This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:47:01 (UTC).

Jackson v. Lusk et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lusk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Susan C. Bucklew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02999

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Susan C. Bucklew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Jackson

Defendants

Werner Enterprises, Inc.

KALEB J. LUSK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Robert Scheele

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

201 N. Franklin St., Ste. 700

Tampa, FL 33602

Jason Gerard Gordillo

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

One Tampa City Center, 201 N Franklin St 7Th Flr

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

Brian David Stokes

Attorney at Alvarez Winthrop Thompson & Storey PA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3511

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/20/2020. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's January 2021 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/9/2020. (DMB) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Order on Motion to Expedite by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Stokes, Brian) Modified on 1/3/2020 (BSN). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Count III of Complaint filed by James Jackson. (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Jackson. (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Jackson. Related case(s): no (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by James Jackson Change of Counsel (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Count III of Complaint (filed in state court on 9/23/2019) by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (LSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Expedite Mediation and Trial (filed in state court 10/25/2019) by James Jackson. (LSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Other Documents Exhibit F-Q

1 #3

State Court Other Documents Exhibit C-D

1 #2

State Court ANSWER Exhibit E

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A & B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of Removal to United States District Court from In the Circuit Court of the Tenth Judicial Circuit, In and for Polk County, case number 2019-CA-003404 filed in State Court on 08/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224554 filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc., KALEB J. LUSK. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A & B, #2 State Court ANSWER Exhibit E, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C-D, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit F-Q, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/20/2020. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's January 2021 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/9/2020. (DMB) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Order on Motion to Expedite by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Stokes, Brian) Modified on 1/3/2020 (BSN). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Count III of Complaint filed by James Jackson. (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Jackson. (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Jackson. Related case(s): no (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by James Jackson Change of Counsel (Gordillo, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a response of no more than 20 pages to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Count III of the Complaint on or before December 23, 2019, in compliance with Local Rule 3.01(b). Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/10/2019. (DMB) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite Mediation and Trial. The parties must meet and confer regarding the preparation and filing of their joint case management report by the earlier of: (a) 60 days after the first defendant is served, or (b) 30 days after the first defendant appears in this case, regardless of the pendency of any undecided motions. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/10/2019. (DMB) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Count III of Complaint (filed in state court on 9/23/2019) by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (LSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Expedite Mediation and Trial (filed in state court 10/25/2019) by James Jackson. (LSS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2999-T-24SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of Removal to United States District Court from In the Circuit Court of the Tenth Judicial Circuit, In and for Polk County, case number 2019-CA-003404 filed in State Court on 08/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224554 filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc., KALEB J. LUSK. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A & B, #2 State Court ANSWER Exhibit E, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C-D, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit F-Q, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less