This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 08:51:16 (UTC).

Jackson v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lowes Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Jackson

Defendants

Lowes Home Centers, LLC

Lowes Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter A. Erdoes

21 E. Main St., Suite 101

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Defendant Attorneys

J. Christopher Davis

Attorney at Johnson & Jones, PC

6120 S Yale Ave, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74136

Maegan Christine Murdock

Attorney at Johnson & Jones, PC

6120 S Yale Ave, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74136

Joshua D. Poovey

Attorney at Johnson & Jones, PC

6120 S Yale Ave, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74136

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 2/11/2022. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2021, Exhibit List due by 1/28/2022, Witness List due by 1/28/2022, Discovery due by 2/14/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2022, Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 4/1/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

13 #2

Defendant's Consent Form

13 #1

Plaintiff's Consent Form

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Consent to US Magistrate by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC [NOTE: Attorney Joshua D. Poovey added to party Lowes Companies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua D. Poovey added to party Lowes Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft)]. (Poovey, Joshua) Modified on 7/12/2021 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

10 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Murdock, Maegan) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Companies, Inc. (Murdock, Maegan) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#7

(#7) JURY DEMAND by Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - EOA

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Answer

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 21-CJ-57 by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 2/11/2022. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2021, Exhibit List due by 1/28/2022, Witness List due by 1/28/2022, Discovery due by 2/14/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2022, Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 4/1/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Consent to US Magistrate by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC [NOTE: Attorney Joshua D. Poovey added to party Lowes Companies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua D. Poovey added to party Lowes Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft)]. (Poovey, Joshua) Modified on 7/12/2021 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Murdock, Maegan) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Companies, Inc. (Murdock, Maegan) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JURY DEMAND by Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/10/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number COKEDC-1515728 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing fee due by 6/17/2021) (Re: #3 Minute Order) (dma, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maegan Christine Murdock on behalf of Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Murdock, Maegan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Christopher Davis on behalf of Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Davis, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/17/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 21-CJ-57 by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketANSWER to Petition filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition) by Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC (filed in State Court on 5/27/2021, prior to removal. See Docket No. 2 Exhibit 4) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION filed in State Court against Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC by Brenda Jackson (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant