This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 16:21:06 (UTC).

Jackson v. Inch et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Inch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisette M. Reid and Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20294

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie Jackson

Live Oak, FL 32060

Defendants

J.R. Delgado

Mark S. Inch

F. Papillion

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 F. Papillion served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jessie Jackson; Recommending that: 1.The claims against Dr. Delgado and Dr. Papillon for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need should proceed; 2.The claim against Mark Inch, should be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 1915(e). Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to F. Papillion. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to J.R. Delgado. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against J.R. Delgado, Mark S. Inch, F. Papillion. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed/NOT PAID/DUE, filed by Jessie Jackson.(ebz) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS REQUIRING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON AN INDIVIDUAL(S): Dr. F. Papillon and Dr. J. Delgado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STRICKEN First for Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26(b), Fed.R.Civ.P. by Jessie Jackson. (drz) Modified on 3/3/2020 stricken per de#8(dj). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessie Jackson. (ebz) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#16

(#16) Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to J.R. Delgado. (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Answer Due Deadline per clerks error: (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to J.R. Delgado. (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#15) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 14 Summons Returned Executed. Document Restricted Due to Error; Summons was unexecuted. Wrong Event used by clerk. (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 F. Papillion served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (drz) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to J.R. Delgado. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to F. Papillion. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS REQUIRING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON AN INDIVIDUAL(S): Dr. F. Papillon and Dr. J. Delgado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER striking #7 Motion to Produce. The Plaintiff's request for production is stricken. The complaint has been screened however the report has not yet been adopted. After the defendants are served a scheduling order will be issued setting a discovery period. Plaintiff is advised that requests for production must be served on the Defendant or person to whom they are directed. Such request should be made after the defendants have been served and filed an answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/2/2020. (jb01) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN First for Production of Documents Pursuant to Rule 26(b), Fed.R.Civ.P. by Jessie Jackson. (drz) Modified on 3/3/2020 stricken per de#8(dj). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Jessie Jackson; Recommending that: 1.The claims against Dr. Delgado and Dr. Papillon for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need should proceed; 2.The claim against Mark Inch, should be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 1915(e). Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Motions referred to Lisette M. Reid. (ebz) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessie Jackson. (ebz) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against J.R. Delgado, Mark S. Inch, F. Papillion. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed/NOT PAID/DUE, filed by Jessie Jackson.(ebz) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.