This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:21:02 (UTC).

Jackson v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11439

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammie Jackson

Defendant

HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Margot Cutter

Attorney at CUTTER LAW, P.C.

401 Watt Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95864

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #7 Master Long Form Complaint by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

6 #6

Orders Extending Discovery Stay

6 #5

Order Aiding Private Settlement

6 #4

Fact Sheet Implementation Order

6 #3

ESI Order

6 #2

Protective Order

6 #1

Case Management Order No. 1-6

#6

(#6) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-6, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#10

(#10) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY STAY. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7 . Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tammie Jackson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-8353127. Payment Type : INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Cutter, Margot) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:20-cv-11439, filed by Tammie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cutter, Margot) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY STAY. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7 . Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #7 Master Long Form Complaint by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-6, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tammie Jackson. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-8353127. Payment Type : INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Cutter, Margot) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Jackson v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:20-cv-11439, filed by Tammie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cutter, Margot) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less