This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 11:49:59 (UTC).

Jackson v. Powers

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Powers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01246

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rasheem Jackson

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Wexford

Justin Hammers

. Powers

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nurse Powers. Waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Powers on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

(#7) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendant Powers. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Rasheem Jackson. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nurse Powers. Waiver sent on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Powers on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/30/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against Defendant Powers. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 7/30/2020, in the amount of $ 55.73; receipt number 14626038185 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $55.73. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/29/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Rasheem Jackson. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Rasheem Jackson (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rasheem Jackson.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less