This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 20:05:04 (UTC).

Jackson v. Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01107

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Jackson

Defendants

Illinois Department of Corrections

Justin Wilks

Warden Dixon Correctional Center

Wexford Health Sources Incorporated

Unknown Employees of Subcontractors of Wexford Health Sources Incorporated

University of Illinois Hospital

Brody Slostad, M.D.

Mayank Kansal, M.D.

St. Anthony Medical Center

Stathis Poulakidas, M.D.

Farhad Farokhi, D.O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence Craig Redmond

Attorney at Attorney at Law

11747 South Longwood Dr

Chicago, IL 60643

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Gabriel Jackson; Jury Demand. (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

status report requirements

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel Jackson by Lawrence Craig Redmond Luanne Bethke Redmond (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gabriel Jackson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application #5 , the application is granted in light of financial indigency. The status report deadline remains in place. R. 3. Separately, an audit was performed on cases filed that allege violation of civil rights by a prisoner or former prisoner. Based on this review, this matter is more properly designated as a Nature of Suit 555 (Prison Conditions). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to change the Nature of Suit to 555. No further action is needed by the parties on this internal-judiciary classification matter. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 7, the Plaintiff is holding off on service of process until a medical-practice certification is obtained. The tracking status hearing of 04/29/2022 is reset to 06/24/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 06/16/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 7, the Plaintiff is holding off on service of process until a medical-practice certification is obtained. The tracking status hearing of 04/29/2022 is reset to 06/24/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 06/16/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report Initial by Gabriel Jackson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application #5 , the application is granted in light of financial indigency. The status report deadline remains in place. R. 3. Separately, an audit was performed on cases filed that allege violation of civil rights by a prisoner or former prisoner. Based on this review, this matter is more properly designated as a Nature of Suit 555 (Prison Conditions). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to change the Nature of Suit to 555. No further action is needed by the parties on this internal-judiciary classification matter. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gabriel Jackson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel Jackson by Lawrence Craig Redmond Luanne Bethke Redmond (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial tracking status hearing set for 04/29/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 04/21/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendants have not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Attachment: #1 status report requirements) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Gabriel Jackson; Jury Demand. (Redmond, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Anthony's Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION, now known as University of Illinois Community Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant