This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2020 at 15:02:59 (UTC).

Jackson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jarvis Jackson

Amarillo, TX 79107-9696

Respondent

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/3/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Petitioner has tendered to the federal court system a pleading addressed to the "Texas Court of Appeals," captioned "Ex parte Jarvis Jackson," and titled "Notice of Appeal." [ECF 3]. Petitioner's pleading has been construed as an attempt to initiate a federal habeas corpus proceeding challenging the constitutionality of his underlying state court conviction. Petitioner has not, however, submitted with his pleading any payment to satisfy the requisite filing fee, nor has he submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified in forma pauperis data sheet from the institution in which he is confined. However, as this case is being transferred to another division in the Northern District of Texas, no ruling will be entered with regard to these deficiencies. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/3/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#3

(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jarvis Jackson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase copied to 3:20cv1421-X. Transfer to Dallas Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Wed Jun 3 12:52:35 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/3/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Petitioner has tendered to the federal court system a pleading addressed to the "Texas Court of Appeals," captioned "Ex parte Jarvis Jackson," and titled "Notice of Appeal." [ECF 3]. Petitioner's pleading has been construed as an attempt to initiate a federal habeas corpus proceeding challenging the constitutionality of his underlying state court conviction. Petitioner has not, however, submitted with his pleading any payment to satisfy the requisite filing fee, nor has he submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified in forma pauperis data sheet from the institution in which he is confined. However, as this case is being transferred to another division in the Northern District of Texas, no ruling will be entered with regard to these deficiencies. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/3/2020) (daa) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Copy of first page (Dkt. 3) included in mailing. Tue Jun 2 11:59:29 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jarvis Jackson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less