This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:30:59 (UTC).

Jackson v. Continental Tire the Americas, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Jackson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and Cameron McGowan Currie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Cameron McGowan Currie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaTonya Jessica Jackson

Rock Hill, SC 29732

Defendants

Continental AG

Continental Tire the Americas, LLC

Adam Love

Erik Lefebvre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Thomas Richmond McPherson, III

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Char NC)

201 N Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Erik Lefebvre.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 29 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#26

(#26) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Continental Tire the Americas, LLC.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

24 #1

Memo in Support

#24

(#24) MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim) by Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(McPherson, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Memo in Support) (dsto, ). (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) Modified on 6/28/2019 to correct filing errors.(dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

22 #1

Memo in Support

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim) by Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(McPherson, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Memo in Support) (dsto, ). (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto, ). Modified on 6/28/2019 to correct filing error. (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Adam Love served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Continental AG served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#16

(#16) Summons Issued as to Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love. Service due by 7/31/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#14

(#15) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order Service - Non-Inmate w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail to Latonya Jessica Jackson, 1808 Rock Glen Drive, Apt. 208, Rock Hill, SC, 29732 (dsto, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#10) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, (1)Summons and (4)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail to Latonya Jessica Jackson, 1808 Rock Glen Drive, Apt. 208, Rock Hill, SC, 29732 (dsto, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LaTonya Jessica Jackson.(dsto, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love, filed by LaTonya Jessica Jackson. Service due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(dsto, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #31 Roseboro Order w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Latonya Jessica Jackson, 1808 Rock Glen Drive, Apt. 208, Rock Hill, SC, 29732 (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #24 MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim) AND #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim). Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/01/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry #23 and Entry #25 Reason: Memo in Supports should not be filed separate. They have been attached to the Motions to Dismiss (#22 & #24 ). (dsto, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Erik Lefebvre.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 29 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adam Love.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 28 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Continental AG.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Continental Tire the Americas, LLC.(McPherson, Thomas) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim) by Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(McPherson, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Memo in Support) (dsto, ). (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto) Modified on 6/28/2019 to correct filing errors.(dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim) by Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(McPherson, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Memo in Support) (dsto, ). (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/28/2019 to correct case number) (dsto, ). Modified on 6/28/2019 to correct filing error. (dsto) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Adam Love served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Continental AG served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Summons Issued as to Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love. Service due by 7/31/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order Service - Non-Inmate w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail to Latonya Jessica Jackson, 1808 Rock Glen Drive, Apt. 208, Rock Hill, SC, 29732 (dsto, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/02/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, (1)Summons and (4)USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail to Latonya Jessica Jackson, 1808 Rock Glen Drive, Apt. 208, Rock Hill, SC, 29732 (dsto, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re: #8 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/09/2019.(dsto) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 4/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/09/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LaTonya Jessica Jackson.(dsto, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by LaTonya Jessica Jackson. Response to Motion due by 4/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Continental AG, Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, Erik Lefebvre, Adam Love, filed by LaTonya Jessica Jackson. Service due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(dsto, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Tire The Americas LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Richmond McPherson, III