This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2019 at 07:52:47 (UTC).

Jackson v. Clerk of Justice Court et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Clerk of Justice Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Donell Jackson

Leakesville, MS 39451

Defendants

Clerk of Justice Court

The Board of Supervisors

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rebecca B. Cowan

Attorney at CURRIE, JOHNSON & MYERS, PA - Jackson

P. O. Box 750, 1044 River Oaks Drive (39232)

Jackson, MS 39205-0750

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for Discovery by David Donell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

8 #1

Cover Letter

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter from David Jackson addressed to Ms. Rebecca B. Cowan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LAT) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Sanctions by David Donell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Justice Court Records on Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 = Circuit Court Records on Plaintiff)(Cowan, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit 2 = Circuit Court Records on Plaintiff

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Justice Court Records on Plaintiff

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A- State Court Record

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Response in Opposition re #3 Response in Opposition re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) filed by David Donell Jackson (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: # 2 Cover Letter) (LAT). filed by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors (Cowan, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

3 #2

Cover Letter

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Response in Opposition re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) filed by David Donell Jackson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #2 Cover Letter) (LAT). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Discovery by David Donell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from David Jackson addressed to Ms. Rebecca B. Cowan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LAT) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Justice Court Records on Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 = Circuit Court Records on Plaintiff)(Cowan, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Response in Opposition re #3 Response in Opposition re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) filed by David Donell Jackson (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: # 2 Cover Letter) (LAT). filed by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors (Cowan, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Sanctions by David Donell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Response in Opposition re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) filed by David Donell Jackson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #2 Cover Letter) (LAT). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors.(Cowan, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Clerk of Justice Court, The Board of Supervisors from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 189-0138. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4030762) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.