This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2023 at 08:29:28 (UTC).

Jackson v. Appling et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Jackson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Appling. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL A. OTAKE and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carmela Lynn Jackson

Zoie Jewel Jackson

Robert Cody Kieffer II

Defendants

Katrina Appling

Omega Mostyn

Heather Broach-Kieffer

Dr. Earlene Hall

Nicki Minaj

Justin Bieber

American Security

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial against Katrina Appling, Omega Mostyn, Heather Broach-Kieffer, Earlene Hall, Nicki Minaj, Justin Bieber, American Security - filed by Carmela Lynn Jackson.(jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Carmela Lynn Jackson. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Carmela Lynn Jackson. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#4

(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/3/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/1/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the foregoing was served upon Carmela Lynn Jackson at the Clerk's Office service counter. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT. Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/2/2023. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaintwith leave to amend and (2) DENIES the IFP Application as moot, ECF No. 3. IfPlaintiffs elect to file an amended complaint, they must comply with the followingrequirements:(1) The deadline to file an amended complaint is March 2, 2023;(2) The amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint";and(3) Plaintiffs must cure the deficiencies identified above.Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and concurrently file new IFP Applications or submit the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action.IT IS SO ORDERED.(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/10/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/10/2023. (jni) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/10/2023 pursuant to ECF #7 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/10/2023. (jni) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/10/2023 pursuant to ECF #7 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/10/2023. (jni) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/10/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/10/2023. (jni) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT. Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/2/2023. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaintwith leave to amend and (2) DENIES the IFP Application as moot, ECF No. 3. IfPlaintiffs elect to file an amended complaint, they must comply with the followingrequirements:(1) The deadline to file an amended complaint is March 2, 2023;(2) The amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint";and(3) Plaintiffs must cure the deficiencies identified above.Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and concurrently file new IFP Applications or submit the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action.IT IS SO ORDERED.(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#5) EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO PARTIES RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) or 12.4(a) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/3/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/1/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the foregoing was served upon Carmela Lynn Jackson at the Clerk's Office service counter. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Carmela Lynn Jackson. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Carmela Lynn Jackson. (jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial against Katrina Appling, Omega Mostyn, Heather Broach-Kieffer, Earlene Hall, Nicki Minaj, Justin Bieber, American Security - filed by Carmela Lynn Jackson.(jni) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less