Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:43:24 (UTC).

Jackson v. American Service Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Jackson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Service Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01695

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda J. Jackson

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

American Service Insurance Company, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Charles Manuel Kea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric F Rosenberg

Attorney at Rosenberg, Fayne & Raden

5400 Kenilworth Avenue

Riverdale Park, MD 20737

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Heather Ann Rice

Attorney at Franklin & Prokopik, PC

2 North Charles Street, Suite 600

Baltimore, MD 21201

Andrew T Stephenson

Attorney at Franklin and Prokopik PC

The B And O Bldg, Two N Charles St Ste 600

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Rosenberg, Eric) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#14

(#14) Summons Issued 21 days as to Charles Manuel Kea. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. re #12 Third Party Complaint Summons on a Third-Party Complaint (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#12

(#12) Third Party THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Charles Manuel Kea, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#11

(#11) Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Linda J. Jackson (Rosenberg, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint of Plaintiff by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/7/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Defendant.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Writ of Summons Issued 60 days as to American Service Insurance Company, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against American Service Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Linda J. Jackson.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-13787, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115746) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Rosenberg, Eric) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued 21 days as to Charles Manuel Kea. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. re #12 Third Party Complaint Summons on a Third-Party Complaint (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Third Party THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Charles Manuel Kea, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Linda J. Jackson (Rosenberg, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint of Plaintiff by American Service Insurance Company, Inc..(Rice, Heather) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/7/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Defendant.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#4) THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Writ of Summons Issued 60 days as to American Service Insurance Company, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against American Service Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Linda J. Jackson.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-13787, filed by American Service Insurance Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115746) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Service Insurance Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Ann Rice

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew T Stephenson