This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:49 (UTC).

Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. v. Orolia USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Orolia USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert C. Jones and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Jones

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Orolia USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad R. Fears

Attorney at Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP

2300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 950

Las Vegas, NV 89102

David W Gutke

Attorney at Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP

2300 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 950

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Damon Guizot

Attorney at Guizot & Mouser

17542 E 17Th St Suite 470

Tustin, CA 92780

Lester Julian Savit

One Llp, One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jonathan Jaech

One Llp, 4000 Mac Arthur Blvd, East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester Julian Savit for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lester Julian Savit and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5833454) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Damon Guizot for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Damon Guizot and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819666) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Orolia USA, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gutke, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - '211 Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Orolia USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5803329) by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '211 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Gutke, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Lester Julian Savit is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester Julian Savit for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lester Julian Savit and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5833454) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Damon Guizot is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Damon Guizot for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Damon Guizot and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819666) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02100-RCJ-DJA. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/9/2019. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Orolia USA, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Damon Guizot, Jonathan Jaech, and Lester Julian Savit to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2020. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gutke, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Orolia USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5803329) by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '211 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Gutke, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less