This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2020 at 07:29:06 (UTC).

JACKSON et al v. VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 JACKSON filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02524

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARY HANS

TYNISHA JACKSON

DAVID CREVELING

Defendants

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEVIN ABRAMOWICZ

Attorney at EAST END TRIAL GROUP LLC

186 - 42Nd St, Po Box 40127

Pittsburgh, PA 15201

KEVIN W. TUCKER

Attorney at East End Trial Group, LLC

186 42Nd St., P.O. Box 40127

Pittsburgh, PA 15201

Defendant Attorneys

CRAIG J. RENITSKY

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DANIEL R. BENTZ

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN COURTNEY PC

707 Grant St, Gulf Tower Ste 2600

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

THOMAS M. PIE, JR.

Attorney at MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY PC

707 Grant St Suite 2600

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. (RENITSKY, CRAIG) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 7/24/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, AUGUST 3, 2020, AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE, ECF NO. 21 IN CV 20-1845; ECF NO. #11 IN CV 20-2524 ARE GRANTED. THIS CONSOLIDATION IS FOR PRE-TRIAL PURPOSES ONLY. THE COURT WILL SET A CONSOLIDATED PRE-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOLLOWING THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IN THE LATER-FILED CASE, CV 20-2524, WHICH THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE IN THE NEAR FUTURE. UNTIL THAT TIME, ALL SCHEDULED HEARINGS, APPEARANCES, AND DEADLINES REMAIN IN PLACE. A COPY OF THIS ORDER SHALL BE DOCKETED IN BOTH CASES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/18/20. 6/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS M. PI JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/8/20. 6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL BENTZ, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/8/20. 6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 6/9/2020 (mas, ). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Pie' Jr. by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14338525.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Bentz by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14338512.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN W. TUCKER on behalf of DAVID CREVELING, MARY HANS, TYNISHA JACKSON (TUCKER, KEVIN) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #4

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14319534), filed by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/29/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. (RENITSKY, CRAIG) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 7/24/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, AUGUST 3, 2020, AT 3:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE, ECF NO. 21 IN CV 20-1845; ECF NO. #11 IN CV 20-2524 ARE GRANTED. THIS CONSOLIDATION IS FOR PRE-TRIAL PURPOSES ONLY. THE COURT WILL SET A CONSOLIDATED PRE-TRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOLLOWING THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE IN THE LATER-FILED CASE, CV 20-2524, WHICH THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE IN THE NEAR FUTURE. UNTIL THAT TIME, ALL SCHEDULED HEARINGS, APPEARANCES, AND DEADLINES REMAIN IN PLACE. A COPY OF THIS ORDER SHALL BE DOCKETED IN BOTH CASES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/18/20. 6/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS M. PI JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/8/20. 6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL BENTZ, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/8/20. 6/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 6/9/2020 (mas, ). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Pie' Jr. by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14338525.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Bentz by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14338512.). (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC.(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN W. TUCKER on behalf of DAVID CREVELING, MARY HANS, TYNISHA JACKSON (TUCKER, KEVIN) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/29/20. 5/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14319534), filed by VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(RENITSKY, CRAIG) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/29/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. PIE, JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG J. RENITSKY