This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 08:56:05 (UTC).

JACKSON COUNTY v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 JACKSON COUNTY filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON COUNTY

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

MALLINCKRODT LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

MALLINCKRODT PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER J MOUGEY

Attorney at LEVIN PAPANTONIO - PENSACOLA FL

316 S Baylen St - Ste 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT - re: 5 Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio - Cleveland. Case transferred from District of Northern Florida has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45283. (cle) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

4 #1

Email Request

#4

(#4) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - (CTO - 88) - re: MDL 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (cle) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4446331.), filed by JACKSON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT - re: 5 Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio - Cleveland. Case transferred from District of Northern Florida has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45283. (cle) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • (#5) Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio - Cleveland located at Carl B. Stokes US Court House, 801 West Superior Avenue, Cleveland, OHIO 44113 - re: MDL 2804. (cle) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - (CTO - 88) - re: MDL 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (cle) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To Attorney PETER MOUGEY re: #1 Complaint. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET (cle) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4446331.), filed by JACKSON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jackson County is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant