This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:11:40 (UTC).

Jackson-Bey v. Whelton

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Jackson-Bey filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Whelton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raner C Collins and Pro Se (Tucson). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raner C Collins

Referral Judge

Pro Se (Tucson)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haneef Jackson-Bey

Tucson, AZ 85734

Defendant

Unknown Whelton

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action withoutprejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner and a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/26/2019. (ARC) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Haneef Jackson-Bey. (10 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT -IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 27, 2019, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (MYE) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S JUDGMENT -IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 27, 2019, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (MYE) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action withoutprejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner and a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/26/2019. (ARC) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Haneef Jackson-Bey. (10 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.