This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:33:08 (UTC).

Jackman et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Jackman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glenn T. Suddaby and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judy Jackman

David R Jackman

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan

Attorney at Martin Harding & Mazzotti, LLP - Albany Office

P.O. Box 15141

Albany, NY 12212

Defendant Attorneys

Vivian M. Quinn

Attorney at Nixon, Peabody Law Firm - Buffalo Office

40 Fountain Plaza, Suite 500

Buffalo, NY 14202

Tracey B. Scarpello

Attorney at Nixon, Peabody Law Firm - Buffalo Office

40 Fountain Plaza, Suite 500

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Letter from Richard B. North, Esq., dd 4/3/2020 advising that he will not be representing defts in this action nor seeking admission in NYND at this time. (plp) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 4/16/2020. {Served electronically upon counsel} (jmb) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03217. electronically transferred when case opened {St. Lawrence County} (jmb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#4

(#4) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13422765 filed by David R Jackman, Judy Jackman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2016)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Richard B. North, Esq., dd 4/3/2020 advising that he will not be representing defts in this action nor seeking admission in NYND at this time. (plp) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER deeming this case related to Doran v. CR Bard Incorporated, et al., Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) under Section G.2. of General Order 12, because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources. Additionally, Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case." ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD ACTION ONLY, 5:19-cv-1126 (GTS/ML). NO FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS ACTION. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/3/2020. (e-mailed counsel copy of text order) (sal) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 4/16/2020. {Served electronically upon counsel} (jmb) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03217. electronically transferred when case opened {St. Lawrence County} (jmb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred to the Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3217-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13422765 filed by David R Jackman, Judy Jackman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less