This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 02:03:49 (UTC).

Jaccuzzo et al v. Home Depot U S A Inc

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Jaccuzzo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol B Whitehurst and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01331

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gloria J Jaccuzzo

Kenneth P Jaccuzzo

Defendant

Home Depot U S A Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Natalie Marie DeJean

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth W DeJean

P O Box 4325

Lafayette, LA 70502

Adam Russell Credeur

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth W DeJean

P O Box 4325

Lafayette, LA 70502

Kenneth W DeJean

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth W DeJean

P O Box 4325

Lafayette, LA 70502

Defendant Attorneys

Milton Davis Ready

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Megan Sara Peterson

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Susan Marie Caruso

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed order

#12

(#12) JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by Gloria J Jaccuzzo, Kenneth P Jaccuzzo, Home Depot U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 1/26/2021 to add filer. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/29/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/4/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 1/26/2021. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/26/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/27/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/26/2021. Discovery deadline 9/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2021. Daubert Motions due by 10/25/2021. Motions in Limine due by 1/24/2022. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2022. Bench Books due by 2/8/2022. Trial Depositions due by 2/8/2022. Real Time glossary due by 2/15/2022. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/15/2022.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 12/8/2020. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A, in globo

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U S A Inc.(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson for Home Depot U S A Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/28/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

7 #1

Proposed order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Lacresha D. Wilkerson to Enroll as Counsel by Home Depot U S A Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Home Depot International Inc as Corporate Parent for Home Depot USA Inc by Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 10/27/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/15/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U S A Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Susan Marie Caruso on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #3

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal on behalf of The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-4511 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4423388) filed by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by Gloria J Jaccuzzo, Kenneth P Jaccuzzo, Home Depot U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,DeJean, Kenneth) Modified on 1/26/2021 to add filer. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/29/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/4/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 1/26/2021. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/26/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/27/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/26/2021. Discovery deadline 9/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2021. Daubert Motions due by 10/25/2021. Motions in Limine due by 1/24/2022. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2022. Bench Books due by 2/8/2022. Trial Depositions due by 2/8/2022. Real Time glossary due by 2/15/2022. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/15/2022.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 12/8/2020. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Home Depot U S A Inc List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, in globo)(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U S A Inc.(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson for Home Depot U S A Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/28/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Lacresha D. Wilkerson to Enroll as Counsel by Home Depot U S A Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Home Depot International Inc as Corporate Parent for Home Depot USA Inc by Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 10/27/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/15/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U S A Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/14/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Susan Marie Caruso on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal on behalf of The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2020-4511 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4423388) filed by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie Marie DeJean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Russell Credeur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth W DeJean