This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2021 at 09:04:03 (UTC).

Joseph Jablonski, Jr. et al v. Claremont Graduate University et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Joseph Jablonski, Jr filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Claremont Graduate University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10695

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph Jablonski, Jr.

Dr. Joseph Jablonski, Jr.

Petitioner and Defendant

Heather Campbell

Defendants

Claremont Graduate University

Estate of Michael Uhlmann

Jean Schroedel

Heather Campbell

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Morgan Heit

Attorney at Heit Law Group PC

340 South Lemon Avenue Suite 8933

Walnut, CA 91789

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Vanessa Katerina Manolatou

Attorney at Epstein Becker and Green PC

1925 Century Park East Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan M Brenner

Attorney at Epstein Becker and Green PC

1925 Century Park East Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit - Acknowledgment of Receipt

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District/Stanley Mosk filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Withdraw of Document No. #16 , Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, on Court Docket for Case No. 2:20-cv-10695 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr.. (Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. In light of the Amended Complaint [Doc. 13], Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint #10 is denied as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata. In response to G112 deficiency notice regarding ONLY the proof of service of first amended complaint, Filer REFILED the First Amended Complaint as docket no. 16. Thus case erroneously has TWO first Amended Complaints on record (no. 16 with proof of service therein). Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE Notice of Errata Regarding Plaintiff's Two First Amended Complaints on the Court Docket For Case No. 2:20-cv-10695 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr.. (Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr.(Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 21 days. Format of proof is type attached to a filed document, No formal title page re MISSING LR-11-3/8 required filer, attorney information Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proof of Service to Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr. re: Amended Complaint/Petition #13 (Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to First Amended Complaint and Table of Contents)(Heit, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-197) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10695 FLA (RAOx). (esa) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/14/2020 filed by Defendant Claremont Graduate University, Heather Campbell, Jean Schroedel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manolatou, Vanessa) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr., upon Defendants Claremont Graduate University acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020; Heather Campbell acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020; Jean Schroedel acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jonathan M Brenner, Counsel for Defendants. Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Claremont Graduate University, Does 1-50, inclusive, Estate of Michael Uhlmann, Heather Campbell, Jean Schroedel. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Jablonski, Jr. Filed in State Court on 7/31/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Claremont Graduate University, Heather Campbell, Jean Schroedel, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 11/23/2020. (Manolatou, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Claremont Graduate University, Heather Campbell, Jean Schroedel, (Manolatou, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Claremont Graduate University, Jean Schroedel, Movant Heather Campbell. (Manolatou, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV38924 Receipt No: ACACDC-29166194 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Jean Schroedel, Claremont Graduate University, Heather Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit - Acknowledgment of Receipt) (Attorney Vanessa Katerina Manolatou added to party Claremont Graduate University(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Katerina Manolatou added to party Heather Campbell(pty:bkmov), Attorney Vanessa Katerina Manolatou added to party Jean Schroedel(pty:dft))(Manolatou, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAREMONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Morgan Heit