This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:21:35 (UTC).

Jabaa, LLC v. Caleres, Inc.

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Jabba, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Jabba”), represented by Cortney S. Alexander of Kent & Risley LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Caleres, Inc. (“Defendant” or “GM”), seeking an accounting of damages along with compensatory damages, and prejudgment and post-judgment interest for the alleged infringement of the ’637 Patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

Plaintiff filed the complaint for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent No. 7,480,637 (’637 Patent”) owned by Plaintiff.

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has made, used, sold, offered for sale, or imported products that incorporate one or more of the inventions claimed in the ʼ637 Patent.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant has in the past and continues to indirectly infringe at least claim 1 of the ʼ637 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by actively, knowingly, and intentionally inducing direct infringement by other persons, including customers and end users, by encouraging and instructing their customers to use the Famous Footwear app in a manner understood and intended to infringe the ʼ637 patent. For example, Defendant instructs its customers to utilize the Famous Footwear app in an infringing manner, including encouraging customers to pay for a purchase using the Google Pay link found in Defendant’s app and utilizing fingerprint authentication.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant also has in the past and continues to indirectly infringe at least claim 1 of the ’637 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(c) by actively, knowingly, and intentionally contributing to an underlying direct infringement by other persons, such as Defendant’s patrons, customers, and end users, by offering and providing Defendant’s Famous Footwear app for download without authority or license from Plaintiff and in a manner understood and intended to infringe the ’637 Patent. For example, Defendant knows that the fingerprint-authentication technique provided in Defendant’s app in connection with Google Pay is both patented and infringing, is not a staple article, and has no substantial non-infringing use.”

There are two claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim deals with the direct infringement of the ʼ637 Patent by the Defendant. The second claim deals with the Indirect Infringement of the ʼ637 Patent.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass a declaration that Defendant has infringed the ʼ637 Patent and an order of injunction against Defendant from further infringement of the ʼ637 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 283. Plaintiff further requested the court to award accounting and damages adequate to compensate Plaintiff for the Defendant’s acts of infringement, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, and costs pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 or any other relief that the court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00341

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jabaa, LLC

Defendant

Caleres, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cortney S Alexander

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC - Alpharett

5755 N. Point Pkwy Ste. 57

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Defendant Attorney

Scott L Davis

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

1900 N Pearl Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,480,637

1 #2

Exhibit B - File History for the '637 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '637 Patent

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jabaa, LLC. Caleres, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott L Davis on behalf of Caleres, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Caleres, Inc..( Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Caleres, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Caleres, Inc..( Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Caleres, Inc. to 11/9/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Caleres, Inc..( Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Caleres, Inc. to 10/25/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Caleres, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Caleres, Inc..( Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott L Davis on behalf of Caleres, Inc. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jabaa, LLC. Caleres, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Caleres, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jabaa, LLC (Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Caleres, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8560626.), filed by Jabaa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,480,637, #2 Exhibit B - File History for the '637 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart for the '637 Patent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Cortney) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less