This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:41:52 (UTC).

J P Market Management v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 J P Market Management filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03737

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J P Market Management

J P Market Management doing business as Motor City

Defendant

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian James Houghtaling

Attorney at Houghtaling Law Firm

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J P Market Management. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J P Market Management. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, requested by JP Market Management dba Motor City. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Market Management dba Motor City. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4867383) filed by JP Market Management dba Motor City. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party JP Market Management dba Motor City(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less