This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:58:16 (UTC).

J M Smith Corporation v. Belvedere Enterprises Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 J M Smith Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Belvedere Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J M Smith Corporation doing business as Smith Drug Company

Defendants

Belvedere Enterprises Inc doing business as Belvedere Pharmacy

Loch Raven Pharmacy Inc doing business as Campus Pharmacy

Anwar Yousuf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Kevin McCarrell

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Certificate of Service

11 #2

Proposed Order for Default Judgment

11 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Attorneys Fees and Costs

#11

8 #1

Affidavit Declaration of M. Kevin McCarrell for Default Request

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A Dept. of Defense Manpower Data Center's Military Verification Ser

#7

6 #3

Affidavit Service of Anwar Yousuf

6 #2

Affidavit Service of Campus Pharmacy

6 #1

Affidavit Service of Belvedere Pharmacy

#6

#4

#3

1 #5

Exhibit E Campus Security Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C Belvedere Guaranty

1 #2

Exhibit B Belvedere Security Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A Belevedere Application

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Belvedere Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Belvedere Pharmacy,Loch Raven Pharmacy, Inc. d/b/a Campus Pharmacy, & Anwar Yousuf by J M Smith Corporation. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorneys Fees and Costs, #2 Proposed Order for Default Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McCarrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021

Docket(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Belvedere Enterprises Inc, Loch Raven Pharmacy Inc, Anwar Yousuf. (kmca) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byJ M Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Kevin McCarrell for Default Request)(McCarrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Non-Military Service for Anwar Yousuf, by J M Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Dept. of Defense Manpower Data Center's Military Verification Service Report)(McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 6/3/2021: to add text (of Non-Military Service...) (kmca). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J M Smith Corporation. Belvedere Enterprises Inc served on 5/10/21, answer due 6/1/21; Loch Raven Pharmacy Inc served on 5/10/21, answer due 6/1/21; Anwar Yousuf served on 5/10/21, answer due 6/1/21. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Belvedere Pharmacy, #2 Affidavit Service of Campus Pharmacy, #3 Affidavit Service of Anwar Yousuf)(McCarrell, Michael) Modified on 5/25/2021: to edit text (add service and answer dates) (kmca). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Belvedere Enterprises Inc, Loch Raven Pharmacy Inc, Anwar Yousuf. (kmca) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J M Smith Corporation.(kmca) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Belvedere Enterprises Inc, Loch Raven Pharmacy Inc, Anwar Yousuf (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9817129), filed by J M Smith Corporation. Service due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Belevedere Application, #2 Exhibit B Belvedere Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Belvedere Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D Campus Application, #5 Exhibit E Campus Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit F Campus Guaranty, #7 Exhibit G Belvedere Pharmacy Open Account, #8 Exhibit H Campus Pharmacy Open Account)(kmca) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less