This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2021 at 18:24:19 (UTC).

J M SMITH CORPORATION v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 J M SMITH CORPORATION filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U S , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04370

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J M SMITH CORPORATION

Defendants

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PLIVA, INC.

AKORN, INC.

EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.

JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

SANDOZ, INC.

VERSAPHARM, INC.

MALLINCKRODT LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

HIKMA LABS, INC.

HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

GREENSTONE LLC

TORRENT PHARMA INC.

DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER PA

1441 Brickell Ave, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

SAMUEL J. RANDALL

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER PA

201 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

MICHAEL A. PONZOLI

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER PA

1441 Brickell Ave Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

JOSHUA BARTON GRAY

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER, P.A.

1101 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., 3Rd Floor

Washington, DC 20004

RICHARD ALAN ARNOLD

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER, P.A.

Four Seasons Tower Suite 1100, 1441 Brickwell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

BRANDON S FLOCH

Attorney at KENNY NACHWALTER, P.A.

1441 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

MICHAEL L. KEELEY

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

950 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

GERALD E. ARTH

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St., 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NATHAN M. BUCHTER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

RACHEL ADCOX

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP HARKRIDER

950 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

EDWARD M. MATHIAS

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

90 State House Square

Hartford, CT 06103

CRAIG M. REISER

Attorney at AXINN VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP

114 West 47Th St

New York, NY 10036

BRYAN DANIEL GANT

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

RYAN THOMAS BECKER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market Street, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

HEATHER K. MCDEVITT

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

DAVID M. MAX

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

JEFFREY C. BANK

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

1301 Avenue Of The Americas 40Th Fl

New York, NY 10019

SETH C. SILBER

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI PC

1700 K St., 5Th Fl

Washington, DC 20006

SETH B. DAVIS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

SETH A. MOSKOWITZ

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#5

#4

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

1 #4

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL LIMITATIONS PERIODS ARE HEREBY SUSPENDED, STAYED, OR TOLLED WITH RESPECT TO THE CLAIMS SET FORTH IN THE COMPLAINT AGAINST ENDO AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ENDO ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES....ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/15/2020. 12/15/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC 1631 IN 16-MD-2724).(kp, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY C. BANK on behalf of MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MYLAN, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(BANK, JEFFREY) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH C. SILBER on behalf of MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MYLAN, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SILBER, SETH) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by CHUL PAK on behalf of MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MYLAN, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(PAK, CHUL) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT EMCURE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY J M SMITH CORP, IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/18/2020. 11/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO.1601 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC.(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC.(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC.(BECKER, RYAN) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Strides Pharma Science Limited with Certificate of Service by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,.(TWEEN, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS M. TWEEN on behalf of STRIDES PHARMA, INC., with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(TWEEN, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(GANT, BRYAN) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BARTON GRAY on behalf of J M SMITH CORPORATION (GRAY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. PONZOLI on behalf of J M SMITH CORPORATION (PONZOLI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON S FLOCH on behalf of J M SMITH CORPORATION (FLOCH, BRANDON) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL J. RANDALL on behalf of J M SMITH CORPORATION (RANDALL, SAMUEL) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GENERICS BIDCO I, LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, GREENSTONE LLC, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., HIKMA LABS, INC., HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT INC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MYLAN, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TORRENT PHARMA INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD COLUMBUS, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/10/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants filed by J M SMITH CORPORATION.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by J M SMITH CORPORATION. (JL ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by J M SMITH CORPORATION.(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14545733.), filed by J M SMITH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/14/2020) (kp, ). (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIKMA LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VERSAPHARM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. is a litigant