This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2019 at 07:01:16 (UTC).

J. G. v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 J G filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00623

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. G.

Defendants

La Clinica De La Raza, Inc.

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Abitabile Cifarelli

Attorney at The Cifarelli Law Firm

7700 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 150

Irvine, CA 92618

J Niley Dorit

Attorney at Dorit Law Firm

220 Montgomery Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit Attachment

#14

13 #1

Exhibit Attachment

#13

12 #1

Exhibit List of documents served

#12

11 #1

Exhibit List of documents served

#11

10 #1

Exhibit List of documents served

#10

9 #1

Exhibit List of documents served

#9

#8

#7

#6

#2

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney J Niley Dorit terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/1/19. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Thomas Abitabile Cifarelli (Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of documents served)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of documents served)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of documents served)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of documents served)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J. G... (Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., United States of America. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 2/7/2019) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Defendants name does not match the name on the Complaint exactly. Please re-file proposed summons in its entirety with the correct name. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by J. G. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/19/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet by J. G. (a minor) (Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13065654.). Filed byJ. G. (a minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cifarelli, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where La Clinica De La Raza is a litigant