This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:37:33 (UTC).

J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. et al v. HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 J FLETCHER CREAMER SON, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-21638

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC.

Defendant

HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN PATRICK LACEY, JR

Attorney at ANDERSON KILL P.C.

One Gateway Center, Suite 1510

Newark, NJ 07102

STEVEN J. PUDELL

Attorney at ANDERSON KILL PC

One Gateway Center, Suite 901

Newark, NJ 07102-2714

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTIAN ANDREW CAVALLO

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

1037 Raymond Blvd, Suite 1010

Newark, NJ 07102

NICOLE MICHELLE CROWLEY

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

1037 Raymond Blvd, Suite 1010

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Letter from Steven J. Pudell, Esq.. (PUDELL, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#12

(#12) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (ld, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph A. Oliva, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/7/2020. (ld, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

10 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

10 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia

10 #1

Declaration Declaration of Nicole Crowley

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole Crowley, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

9 #7

Certificate of Service

9 #6

Exhibit E

9 #5

Exhibit D

9 #4

Exhibit C

9 #3

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification Steven J. Pudell, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(PUDELL, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

6 #4

Text of Proposed Order

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

6 #2

Certification

6 #1

Memorandum of Law In Support

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter from Steven J. Pudell, Esq.. (PUDELL, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (ld, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph A. Oliva, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/7/2020. (ld, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia attached to D.E #10 submitted by NICOLE CROWLEY on 2/5/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole Crowley, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification Steven J. Pudell, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(PUDELL, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) . (PUDELL, STEVEN) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK LACEY, JR on behalf of CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. (LACEY, JOHN) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE MICHELLE CROWLEY on behalf of HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (CROWLEY, NICOLE) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #1 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2020. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. identifying ALTOHA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (CAVALLO, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. from Superior Court, Law Division: Bergen County, case number BER-L-08052-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10194510), filed by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jr) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney CHRISTIAN ANDREW CAVALLO for HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(CAVALLO, CHRISTIAN) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.