This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 07:53:21 (UTC).

J and J Consulting Services, Inc. et al v. Murphy et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 J and J Consulting Services, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cristina D. Silva and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01532

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cristina D. Silva

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J and J Consulting Services, Inc.

J and J Purchasing, LLC

Defendants

Steel Dust Properties, LLC

Mark A. Murphy

Mark A. Murphy, LTD

American Colocation Services, LLC

Black Rock Business Services, LLC

Mark A. Murphy Foundation

Pleasure Investments, LLC

Patriot Business Services, LLC

Rockin K Ranch, LLC

Virginia A. Kirkendall Foundation

Triangle Consultants, LLC

Trustee

US Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Garman

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon

7251 Amigo Street, Suite 210

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Trustee Attorney

U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas

300 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 4300

Las Vegas, NV 89101-5803

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Transmittal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per LR 42-1 and 2 Consolidation Minute Order. (SLD) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/20/2022. This action has been received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court after a Motion for Withdrawal of Reference was granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 2:22-cv-01352 (BK-22-10942-mkn), Case No. 2:22-cv-01532 (BK-22-10943-mkn), and Case No. 2:22-cv-01537 (BK-S-22-10943-mkn)(along with all related Adversary Proceedings Nos. 22-1061; 22-1062; 22-1066; 22-1069; 22-1070), shall be administratively consolidated. Case No. 2:22-cv-01352 shall be designated the lead case and all pleadings and papers relevant in those matters shall be filed into the record in 2:22-cv-01352-CDS-EJY.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSMITTAL of MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Plaintiffs J and J Consulting Services, Inc., J and J Purchasing, LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal) (KF) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&J Consulting Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant