This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:06:03 (UTC).

IWER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 IWER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06519

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM IWER

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael M. Weinkowitz

Attorney at LEVIN SEDRAN & BERMAN

510 Walnut Streetsuite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Peter E. Goss

Attorney at THE GOSS LAW FIRM, P.C.

1501 Westport Road

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#15

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

*Restricted*

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#11) Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 8:21-cv-1548 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6514-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 8:21-cv-1575 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6515-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Georgia, Cause No. 1:21-cv-1485 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6516-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Iowa, Cause No. 4:21-cv-200 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6517-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 3:21-cv-122 on 7/20/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6518-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 2:21-cv-1637 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6519-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Utah, Cause No. 1:21-cv-53 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6520-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Virginia, Cause No. 4:21-cv-28 on 7/19/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6521-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Wisconsin, Cause No. 1:21-cv-698 on 7/19/2021,assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6522-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06514-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06515-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06516-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06517-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06518-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06520-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06521-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06522-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/20/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Goss on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM IWER. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06519-RLY-TAB (Goss, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01637. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF OCTOBER 15, 2014, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD L. YOUNG. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM IWER re: Daniel Eberle served Summons and Complaint upon COOK MEDICAL, LLC by Personal Service. COOK MEDICAL, LLC served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM IWER re: Daniel Eberle served Summons and Complaint upon COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED by Personal Service. COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM IWER re: Daniel Eberle served Summons and Complaint upon COOK INCORPORATED by Personal Service. COOK INCORPORATED served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM IWER re: Daniel Eberle served Summons and Complaint upon COOK GROUP INCORPORATED by Personal Service. COOK GROUP INCORPORATED served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL, LLC. E-mailed to counsel on 4/7/21 (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by WILLIAM IWER. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15037976.), filed by WILLIAM IWER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2021.] (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael M. Weinkowitz