This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2022 at 09:11:26 (UTC).

IVY v. TRAVELERS INS. CO. et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 IVY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRAVELERS INS CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01228

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYNDALE R. IVY

Pendleton, IN 46064

Defendants

TRAVELERS INS. CO.

DANIEL M. WITTE

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit Trust Account Statement

2 #2

Envelope

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY GRANTING 12 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - This matter is before the Court on pro se Plaintiff Lyndale R. Ivy's ("Ivy") Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. #2 ). Because he is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis, this action is also subject to screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Ivy's Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. 2) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Ivy must file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement or an amended complaint by no later than Friday, July 29, 2022. If no Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement or amended complaint is filed by that date, this action may be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. If an amended complaint is filed by the deadline, it will be screened. (See Order). Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/27/2022. (AKH) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#7

(#7) ENTRY DISCHARGING SHOW CAUSE ORDER AND DIRECTING SERVICE - In the Entry of June 27, 2022, the Court notified Plaintiff of the deficiencies in his jurisdictional allegations in his Complaint and ordered him to file an amended complaint or a supplemental jurisdictional statement to cure the deficiencies no later than July 29, 2022 (Dkt. #5 ). On July 11, 2022, Plaintiff timely filed his Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement (Dkt. #6 ), wherein he cures the deficiencies of his jurisdictional allegations in his Complaint. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis (see Dkt. #5 ), the Clerk is designated to issue process to Defendants Travelers Insurance Company and Daniel M. Witte in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), the Screening Entry (Dkt. #5 ), and this Entry. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/5/2022. (AKH) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: 1. Travelers Insurance Company; 2. Daniel M. Witte. (AKH) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: 1. Travelers Insurance Company; 2. Daniel M. Witte. (AKH) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY DISCHARGING SHOW CAUSE ORDER AND DIRECTING SERVICE - In the Entry of June 27, 2022, the Court notified Plaintiff of the deficiencies in his jurisdictional allegations in his Complaint and ordered him to file an amended complaint or a supplemental jurisdictional statement to cure the deficiencies no later than July 29, 2022 (Dkt. #5 ). On July 11, 2022, Plaintiff timely filed his Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement (Dkt. #6 ), wherein he cures the deficiencies of his jurisdictional allegations in his Complaint. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis (see Dkt. #5 ), the Clerk is designated to issue process to Defendants Travelers Insurance Company and Daniel M. Witte in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), the Screening Entry (Dkt. #5 ), and this Entry. Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/5/2022. (AKH) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement, filed by LYNDALE R. IVY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKH) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY GRANTING 12 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - This matter is before the Court on pro se Plaintiff Lyndale R. Ivy's ("Ivy") Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. #2 ). Because he is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis, this action is also subject to screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Ivy's Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Full Filing Fee (Filing No. 2) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Ivy must file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement or an amended complaint by no later than Friday, July 29, 2022. If no Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement or amended complaint is filed by that date, this action may be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. If an amended complaint is filed by the deadline, it will be screened. (See Order). Copies sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/27/2022. (AKH) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LYNDALE R. IVY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(JSR) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TRAVELERS INS. CO., DANIEL M. WITTE, filed by LYNDALE R. IVY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JSR) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant