This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:34:05 (UTC).

Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Triple-S Advantage, Inc

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc. (“Ivision” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala of Holland & Knight LLP, filed a contract lawsuit against Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (“Triple-S” or “Defendant”), seeking damages with interest, along with legal fees and expenses for the alleged breach of Agreement by, among other things, failing to pay Ivision over $600,000.00 due to Ivision under the Agreement. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Puerto Rico. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “Ivision and Triple-S entered into a contract effective January 1, 2017 (the “Agreement”). The Agreement (without attachments and addendums) is attached hereto as Exhibit A.” “In the Agreement, Ivision agreed to sell and/or provide Triple-S certain vision care products and services for Triple-S’ members. The benefits covered under the Agreement are described in Addendum A thereto, as amended.”

The plaintiff further alleged that, “In section 3.00 of the Agreement, titled “Rates and Payment,” Ivision and Triple-S agreed that Triple-S “shall pay IVISION the amounts stated in Addendum B, titled Annual Rates.” “In section 3.02 of the Agreement, Triple-S agreed that it would pay Ivision each capitation premium payment due under the Agreement “by the tenth (10th) day of each month for that month’s premium.” “In Section 3.02, Triple-S also agreed that “[f]ee for service payments …are due by [Triple-S] within fifteen (15) days of the date of the weekly issued invoice.”

The plaintiff further alleged that, “Section 3.02 affords Triple-S a grace period of fifteen (15) days for late payments (both capitation premium and fee for service payments). However, if the payments due are not paid by the end of the grace period, Triple-S must pay Ivision an additional fee of three percent (3%) of the total outstanding amount on a monthly pro rata basis.” “Finally, the Agreement provides that “[i]n the event it becomes necessary [for] IVISION to engage counsel to address any issue relating to lack of payment by [Triple-S] after the expiration of any grace period, IVISION shall be entitled to collect from [Triple-S] all legal fees and expenses incurred by IVISION as a result of [Triple-S’] failure to timely pay IVISION any amounts due to IVISION.”

The only claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff is for the alleged breach of contract, wherein the plaintiff claimed that, in the last few years, Triple-S has repeatedly failed to make timely payments to Ivision as required by section 3.00 of the Agreement. Because Triple-S has allegedly not made most of the past due payments to Ivision within the applicable grace period, Triple-S began incurring additional fees of 3% on the outstanding amounts pursuant to section 3.02 of the Agreement.

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested the court enter judgment against Triple-S awarding Ivision the recovery of the all damages suffered by Ivision as a result of Triple-S breach of the Agreement, all legal fees and expenses incurred (and to be incurred) by Ivision as a result of Triple-S failure to timely pay Ivision amounts due to Ivision, interest, and every other remedy the Court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01412

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc

Defendant

Triple-S Advantage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala

Defendant Attorney

Jorge I. Peirats

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Email

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Category Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

3 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc upon Triple-S Advantage, Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Triple-S Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Peirats, Jorge) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Triple S Advantage shall plead or otherwise defend by November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/18/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of Triple-S Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Peirats, Jorge) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ivision International of Puerto Rico, Inc upon Triple-S Advantage, Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TRIPLE-S ADVANTAGE, INC., a Puerto Rico corporation ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7433325.), filed by IVISION INTERNATIONAL OF PUERTO RICO, INC., a Florida corporation. Service due by 11/29/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email, #3 Summons, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less